+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 18-Schmitt
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (0285S.04C)
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 18-Schmitt
On December 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor