+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed
- S Concurred in HCS
On May 3, 2001 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
- HCS H adopted
On April 25, 2001 in the House:
- H Rules & Joint Rules Committee Concurs w/Committee of origin - Place Bill on H Consent Calendar
On April 24, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Rules & Joint Rules Committee
- Removed from H Consent Calendar
On April 12, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government & Related Matters Committee - Consent
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government & Related Matters Committee - Consent
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Local Government & Related Matters Committee
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Local Government & Related Matters Com.
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 13, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Insurance & Housing Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance & Housing Com.-Consent
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Insurance & Housing Com.-Consent
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Housing Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor