+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 176-Munzlinger, et al
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 176-Munzlinger, et al
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor