+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 176-Dixon
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 176-Dixon
On December 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor