+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- H recedes on HCS, as amended
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- HA 3 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dohrman)--(0971H04.11H)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (McCreery)--(0971H04.02H)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered (Kolkmeyer)--(0971H04.12H)
- HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Carpenter)--(0971H04.16H)
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black-137)--(0971H04.03H)
- HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(0971H04.08H)
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Butz)--(0971H04.04H)
- HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roberts-77)--(0971H04.07H)
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means
- Committee vote reconsidered
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Ways and Means
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0971S.03C)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 174-Crawford
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (15)
0971H04.05H
Distributed
0971H04.21H
Distributed
0971H04.16H
Adopted
0971H04.15H
Distributed
0971H04.14H
Distributed
0971H04.12H
Adopted
0971H04.11H
Adopted
0971H04.09H
Distributed
0971H04.10H
Distributed
0971H04.08H
Adopted
0971H04.07H
Adopted
0971H04.06H
Distributed
0971H04.04H
Withdrawn
0971H04.03H
Adopted
0971H04.02H
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor