+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (In Fiscal Review)
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Health Care Policy Committee
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H (hcomm) Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Health Care Policy Committee
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Referred H Health Care Policy Committee
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- SS for SCS S adopted
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Purgason)--(0845S10.01F)
- SS for SCS S offered (Rupp)--(0845S.10F)
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee (0845S.07C)
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On January 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 167-Rupp
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor