+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed
- S concurs in HCS, as amended
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- HA 4 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bondon)--(0888H05.26H)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered (Stacy)--(0888H05.05H)
- HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Falkner III)--(0888H05.22H)
- HA 2 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Shaul-113)--(0888H05.21H)
- HA 3 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Beck)--(0888H05.25H)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Ellington)--(0888H05.17H)
- HA 5 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Runions)--(0888H05.28H)
- HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H withdrawn
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Griesheimer)--(0888H05.12H)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Stacy)--(0888H05.15H)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Insurance Policy
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Crawford)
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
- Perfected
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee w/SCS
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (0888S.04C)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 167-Crawford
On December 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (25)
0888H05.21H
Withdrawn
0888H05.28H
Adopted
0888H05.27H
Distributed
0888H05.26H
Adopted
0888H05.25H
Adopted
0888H05.22H
Adopted
0888H05.19H
Distributed
0888H05.18H
Distributed
0888H05.15H
Adopted
0888H05.05H
Withdrawn
0888H05.17H
Returned
0888H05.16H
Distributed
0888H05.12H
Adopted
0888H05.06H
Distributed
0888H05.14H
Distributed
0888H05.11H
Distributed
0888H05.13H
Distributed
0888H05.09H
Distributed
0888H05.08H
Distributed
0888H05.07H
Distributed
0888H05.04H
Distributed
0888H05.03H
Distributed
0888H05.02H
Distributed
0888H05.01H
Distributed
0888S04.01S
SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Crawford)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor