+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- HA 2 H offered & Ruled out of order (Cunningham)--(0005L01.01H)
- HA 1 H offered & withdrawn (Cooper)--(0055L01.03H)
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Affairs Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Affairs Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Affairs Committee
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Referred H Special Committee on Government Affairs Committee
On March 9, 2007 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Ways & Means Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means Committee - Consent
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On January 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor