+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Delivered to Governor
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Professional Registration and Licensing Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Professional Registration and Licensing Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Professional Registration and Licensing Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Referred H Special Committee on Professional Registration and Licensing Committee
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- SCS S adopted
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee (0236S.03C)
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee
On January 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor