+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
- Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On March 30, 2007 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Education Committee to Floor - Consent
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - Consent
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On January 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor