+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 24, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government & Related Matters Committee
On April 18, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Local Government & Related Matters Committee
On April 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Local Government & Related Matters Committee
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 3, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On March 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SS S offered & adopted (Mathewson) (0369S.03F)
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 S offered & adopted (Klarich)
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Local Government & Economic Development Committee to Floor
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Economic Development Committee
On January 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Economic Development Committee
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Economic Development Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor