+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Referred H Elections Committee
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor