+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
On January 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor