+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 130-Kraus, with SCS
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0034S.02C)
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 130-Kraus
On December 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor