+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Hearing Conducted
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee - Consent
- Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee - Consent
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(21)(f)
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- Referred H Judiciary Committee
- H Second Read
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent (5391S.02C)
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 1235-Justus
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor