+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 12, 2006 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On May 10, 2006 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On May 8, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Health Care Facilities Committee
On May 4, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Health Care Facilities Committee
On May 2, 2006 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Health Care Facilities Committee
On April 20, 2006 in the House:
- Re-referred H Special Committee on Health Care Facilities Committee
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Referred H Judiciary Committee
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 13, 2006 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
On April 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On April 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Callahan)--(5340S06.09S)
- SA 2 to SS for SCS S adopted
- SSA 1 for SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Callahan)--(5340S06.01F)
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Koster)--(5340S06.05S)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Koster)--(5340S06.04S)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SS for SCS S offered (Koster)--(5340S.06F)
On April 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass (SCS/SBs 1210, 1244 & 844) S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee (5340S.03C)
On March 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor