+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Requests to Recede or Grant Conference Calendar--SCS for SB 1209-Callahan, with HCS, as amended (Senate requests House recede or grant conference)
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruestman)--(5303L05.11H)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered (Silvey)--(5303L05.62H)
- HSA 1 for HA 3 to HCS H offered (Flook)--(5303L05.77H)
- Laid over
- Taken up for 3rd Reading
- HSA 1 for HA 3 to HCS H adopted
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hubbard)--(5303L05.06L)
- HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (St. Onge)--(5303L05.02L)
- HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Weter)--(5303L05.51H)
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- S requests H recede or grant conference
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Corcoran)--(5303L05.07L)
- HA 9 to HCS H offered (Cunningham)--(5303L05.70H)
- HSA 1 for HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Robb)--(5303L05.73H)
- HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Onder)--(5303L05.04L)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- HA 2 to HCS H adopted
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sutherland)--(5303L05.14L)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered (Sutherland)--(5303L05.15L)
- Placed on Calendar
On May 7, 2008 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 5, 2008 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules - HCS Reported Do Pass
On May 5, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Hearing Conducted
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(21)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Ways & Means Committee
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Ways & Means Committee
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Ways & Means Committee
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- Referred H Ways & Means Committee
- H Second Read
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee - Consent (5303S.02C)
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 1209-Callahan
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor