+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Veterans
- Voted Do Pass H Veterans
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Veterans
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred H Veterans
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- SS for SCS S offered (White)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hoskins)
- SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Eigel)
- SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Eslinger)
- SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- Perfected
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee w/SCS
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee (0943S.04C)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (5)
0943S06.05H
Distributed
0943S06.04S
SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Eslinger)
0943S06.06S
SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Eigel)
0943S06.05S
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hoskins)
0943S.06F
SS for SCS S offered (White)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor