+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On April 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken up for Perfection
On March 30, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee
On January 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On January 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor