+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws
- HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session continued - Action Postponed
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from S General Laws Committee w/SCS
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (0036S.02C)
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor