+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation & Motor Vehicle Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Transportation and Motor Vehicle Committee
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Referred H Transportation and Motor Vehicle Committee
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee-Consent (0321S.03C)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee-Consent
On January 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor