+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Retirement Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Retirement Committee-Consent
- Reported Do Pass H Retirement Committee-Consent
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Retirement Committee
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Pensions & Genearl Laws Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Pensions & General Laws Committee
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Pensions & General Laws Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Pensions & General Laws Committee
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor