+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed
- S concurs in HCS
On May 2, 2006 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
- HCS H adopted
On April 13, 2006 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Higher Education Committee - Consent
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Higher Education Committee - Consent
- Hearing Conducted H Higher Education Committee
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Referred H Higher Education Committee
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 29, 2006 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On March 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On March 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee - Consent (5319S.04C)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee - Consent
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor