+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 109-Brown, with SCS
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee - (0680S.04C)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 109-Brown
On January 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor