+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Hearing Scheduled H Local Government Committee--(Upon Morning Recess - HR 4)
On April 24, 2008 in the House:
- Referred H Local Government Committee
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee - Consent (4970S.02C)
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 1089-Justus
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor