+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Financial Services Com.-Consent
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Financial Services Committee-Consent
- Hearing Conducted H Financial Services Committee
On April 6, 2004 in the House:
- Hearing Cancelled H Financial Services Committee
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Financial Services Committee
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Small Business, Insurance & Ind. Relations Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industrial Relations Committee-Consent (3791S.03C)
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industrial Relations Committee-Consent
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industrial Relations Committee
On January 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor