+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1074-Schmitt, with SCS
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee, with SCS
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Seniors, Families and Children Committee - Consent vote adopted (6574S.02C)
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (6574S.02C)
- Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 1074-Schmitt
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor