+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- HCS H defeated
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee w/HCAs 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8 & 9
- Voted Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee w/HCAs 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8 & 9
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee w/Amendments
- Hearing Conducted H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Pearce)--(0642S03.02S)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor, with SCS
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee (0642S.03C)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 107-Sater
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0642S03.02S
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor