+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Judiciary Committee
- H Second Read
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- H First Read (w/EC)
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent - EC adopted
- SCS S adopted
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee-Consent (3580S.03C)
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor