+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- S Inf Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On May 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered (Dougherty)
- SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Singleton)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Singleton)
- SS for SCS S offered (Rohrbach) (3935S.08F)
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Insurance & Housing Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass (SCS SBs 1063 & 827) S Insurance & Housing Committee (3935S.06C)
On February 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Insurance & Housing Committee
On February 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Insurance & Housing Committee
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor