+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1046-Mayer, with SA 1 & SSA 1 for SA 1 (pending)
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SSA 1 for SA 1 S offered (Callahan)--(4744S01.05S)
- SA 1 S offered (Callahan)--(4744S01.03S)
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee to Floor
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 1046-Mayer
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor