+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 8, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Hearing Conducted
On May 7, 2008 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(21)(f)
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Referred H Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
On April 28, 2008 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 24, 2008 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks & Natural Resources Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks & Natural Resources Committee (4435S.04C)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks & Natural Resources Committee
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks & Natural Resources Committee
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 1040-Clemens
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor