+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Combined in H General Laws Committee with HCS for SCS for SB 157 & SB 102
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws Committee
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- SA 1 S offered (Kraus)--(0572S01.01S)
- SA 1 to SA 1 S offered (Justus)--(0572S01.05S)
- SA 2 S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(0572S01.06S)
- SA 1 S withdrawn
- SA 3 S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(0572S01.08S)
- Perfected, as amended
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 102-Kraus
On January 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor