+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Health Care Policy Committee
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Health Care Policy Committee
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Health Care Policy Committee
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Health Care Policy Committee
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- H Second Read
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- H First Read
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On January 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On January 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
- SA 2 to SCS S offered & Ruled out of order (Wheeler)
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & Ruled out of order (Bray)
On January 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Aging, Families, Mental & Public Health Committee to Floor w/SCS
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Aging, Families, Mental & Public Health Committee (3472S.04C)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Aging, Families, Mental & Public Health Committee
On January 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Aging, Families, Mental & Public Health Committee
On January 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor