+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed
- S concurs in HCS
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Rule 45(d) - HCS adopted by consent
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Hearing Conducted
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(21)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee - Consent
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee - Consent
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Referred H Local Government Committee
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 1002-Justus, et al
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor