+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (w/EC)
On May 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed (w/EC)
On May 12, 2006 in the House:
- CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- CCR H adopted
On May 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- CCR S adopted
On May 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- CCR S offered
- Motion to adopt CCR withdrawn
On May 4, 2006 in the House:
- H submits CCR
On May 1, 2006 in the House:
- H conferees appointed: St. Onge, Parson, Schlottach, Daus, Henke
On April 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed: Griesheimer, Stouffer, Alter, Days, Callahan
On April 27, 2006 in the House:
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
On April 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- S requests H recede or grant conference
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
On April 25, 2006 in the House:
- HA 3 H adopted
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (St. Onge)--(4958S03.05L)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered (Daus)--(4958L03.01L)
- HA 1 to HA 3 H offered & Ruled out of order (Skaggs)--(4958L03.03F)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (St. Onge)--(4958L03.02F)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order(Roark)--(4958L03.01H)
- HA 5 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Dusenberg)--(4958L03.02H)
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & Ruled out order (Henke)--(4958L03.06L)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee
On March 29, 2006 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Referred H Transportation Committee
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- H First Read (w/EC)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 4 to SCS S offered & defeated(Barnitz)--(4958S02.06S)
- SA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Barnitz)--(4958S02.02S)
- SA 2 to SCS S offered & Ruled out of order (Scott)--(4958S02.09S)
- SA 1 to SCS S adopted
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 to SCS S offered (Griesheimer)--(4958S02.04S)
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass (SCS/SBs 1001, 896 & 761) S Transportation Committee (4958S.02C)
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor