+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1000-Justus
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee to Floor
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 1000-Justus
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor