+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0830S.04C)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor