+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 10-Cunningham, with SCS & SA 1 (pending)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 to SCS S offered (Williams)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee w/SCS
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee (0409S.04C)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 10-Cunningham
On December 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0409S04.03S
SA 1 to SCS S offered (Williams)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor