+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed
- S concurs in HA 1
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- HA 2 H offered & Ruled out of order (Shoemyer)
- HA 1 H offered & adopted (Merideth)
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended
- HA 3 H offered & withdrawn (Holand)
- HA 4 H offered & Ruled out of order (Wilson 25)
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- Removed from H Consent Calendar
- Motion to reconsider Third Reading Vote H adopted
On April 22, 2003 in the House:
- Defeated on House Third Reading
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Tourism & Cultural Affairs Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Tourism & Cultural Affairs Committee - Consent
- Reported Do Pass H Tourism & Cultural Affairs Committee - Consent
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- Referred H Tourism & Cultural Affairs Committee
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS#2 S adopted
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS#2 - Consent
On February 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS#2 Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee-Consent (0202S.05C)
- Committee Vote Reconsidered S Transportation Comm.
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Removed from S Consent Calendar
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS-Consent
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee-Consent (0202S.03C)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On January 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor