+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Commerce
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
6194H01.01H
Distributed