+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Elections and Elected Officials
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 3, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor