+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 25, 2007, 12:00PM,SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Adopted
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on State Parks and Waterways
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor