+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Adopted - HA 1 adopted
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Commerce
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Trade and Tourism
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
5989H01.01H
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2016: HR 69 (*HA 1)
March 16, 2016: HR 69
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor