+ − Actions (13)
On April 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- Adopted - YEAS: 25 NAYS: 0
On March 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- HCR Adopted and Third Read - HA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 142 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 17, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Miscellaneous Bills and Resolutions
On January 15, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor