+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
- Introduced and Read First Time
- Introduced and Read First Time