+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor