+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 1 TO SA 1 OFFERED
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 103 NOES: 50
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted - AYES: 102 NOES: 51
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 10, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
4459H02.01H
Returned
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor