+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 25, 2006 in the House:
- Motion to Do Pass Failed
- Executive Session Completed
On March 28, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on General Laws
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor