+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Emerging Issues in Health Care
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 6, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled